Financial history BRITISH ANDROLOGY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1155502
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £6.67k £19.44k £10.62k £10.93k £2.04k
Total expenditure £7.62k £8.10k £6.63k £10.98k £9.68k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A