EVANGELICAL PRAYER WINNERS MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE COUNSELLING,ADVOCACY &SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS.WE TEACH THE WORD OFFER PRAYERS TO HELP THE RELIEVE OF PSYCHOLOGICAL & EMOTIONAL TRAUMA, DISTRESSES, FINANCIAL DIFFICULTIES, MARRIAGE BREAKDOWN, DRUG & ALCOHOL DEPENDENCY OF INDIVIDUALS THAT SEEK OUR HELP IN THOSE AREAS.WE DO HUMANITARIAN SERVICES THROUGH DONATION OF ITEMS TO THE NEEDY GROUPS IN GHANA ETC.WE ORGANISE EVENTS TO RELIEVE ISOLATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
- Haringey
- Milton Keynes
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 17 April 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
APOSTLE SOLOMON SACKEY | Chair | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Koranteng - Asante | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sena Abena Awittor | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATIENCE IRIS TETTEH | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.07k | £43.88k | £36.56k | £40.97k | £30.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.59k | £34.71k | £32.42k | £44.89k | £32.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 January 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 January 2024 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 January 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 January 2021 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 DEC 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/04/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/04/2014
Charitable objects
1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE. 1.2 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 NETHERMEAD COURT
NORTHAMPTON
NN3 8NF
- Phone:
- 07712295802
- Email:
- evangelicomk@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
evangelicalwinners.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window