ELGAR WORKS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Publishing of music scores, parts and books relating principally to the composer Edward Elgar; Sponsorship of performances and recordings of musical works principally by the composer Edward Elgar.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 07 May 2014: Standard registration
- 07 February 2017: Funds received from 1086576 ELGAR SOCIETY EDITION LIMITED
- ELGAR WORKS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr STEVEN WILLIAM HALLS MA, PhD | Chair | 23 January 2014 |
|
|||||
John Dominic WIlson | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
FRANK GENE BECK | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Norris | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ann Vernau | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/01/2020 | 02/01/2021 | 02/01/2022 | 02/01/2023 | 02/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.77k | £61.26k | £26.25k | £38.47k | £20.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.19k | £54.39k | £34.56k | £31.26k | £23.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 January 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2023 | 26 July 2024 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2023 | 26 July 2024 | 267 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 January 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 January 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 January 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 JAN 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/03/2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN CONNECTION WITH THE LIFE AND MUSIC OF EDWARD ELGAR IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PUBLICATION AND CIRCULATION OF HIS WORKS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 HIGH STREET
RICKMANSWORTH
WD3 1ER
- Phone:
- 01923775882
- Email:
- works@elgar.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window