MANCHESTER REVOLUTION WHEELCHAIR BASKETBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sporting - To promote sport as a positive focus in the health and wellbeing in disabled people's lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 July 1975: Standard registration
- MANCHESTER REVOLUTION (Working name)
- Manchester Revolution (Previous name)
- MANCHESTER REVOLUTION DISABLED SPORTS CLUB (Previous name)
- OLDHAM OWLS DISABLED SPORTS CLUB (Previous name)
- ORGANISATION OF WHEELCHAIR AND LE (Previous name)
- THE OWLS (Previous name)
- THE OWLS DISABLED SPORTS APPEAL (Previous name)
- THE OWLS DISABLED SPORTS CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dean Cavanagh | Chair | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Anderson | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Baker | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Johnson | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Garry PEEL | Trustee | 08 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Lloyd | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.28k | £17.84k | £1.90k | £2.01k | £8.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.09k | £10.63k | £2.50k | £6.26k | £5.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 April 2025 | 258 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 03 November 2023 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 August 2022 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 April 2021 | 251 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 14 May 2021 | 288 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MAR 1975 AS AMENDED ON 21 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 22 AUG 2022 AS AMENDED ON 04 APR 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PERSONS BY THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF ACTIVE SPORTS AMONG SUCH DISABLED PERSONS AND BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND OTHER VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE OLDHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Clifton Drive
Heald Green
CHEADLE
Cheshire
SK8 3UF
- Phone:
- 07739831835
- Email:
- dean.cavanagh@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window