Stamford Health, Education & Awareness Charity

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support such general health awareness for NHS patients as are deemed to be of public benefit, within the boundaries of the 4 Counties Primary Care Network (hereinafter called the Area) as currently defined by the NHS, as Lakeside Stamford Healthcare and Hereward Practice, Bourne.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 15 January 2014: Standard registration
- 01 October 2018: Funds received from 1081415 SHEEPMARKET PATIENTS GROUP
- Lakeside Healthcare Stamford Patient Participation Group (Working name)
- Lakeside Healthcare Stamford Patient Participation Group (Previous name)
- ST MARY'S MEDICAL CENTRE PATIENT GROUP (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Spurr | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
HARRISH BISNAUTHSING | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Freestone | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97 | £56 | £7 | £109 | £231 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.13k | £338 | £409 | £699 | £557 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/11/2013 AS AMENDED ON 08/01/2014 as amended on 29 Jan 2018 as amended on 04 Nov 2019 as amended on 09 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE THE GOOD HEALTH OF PATIENTS OF LAKESIDE HEALTHCARE, STAMFORD, LINCOLNSHIRE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Christ Church Close
Stamford
PE9 1HS
- Phone:
- 07747600349
- Email:
- gfreestone1@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window