Financial history RE:VISION NORTH LIMITED

Charity number: 1156046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.82m £717.92k £142.23k £300.66k £1.56m
Total expenditure £1.05m £628.46k £801.65k £731.15k £870.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.77m £625.00k N/A N/A £1.50m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £26.50k £66.46k N/A N/A £6.49k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £25.23k £26.46k N/A N/A £50.83k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.05m £628.46k N/A N/A £870.94k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.20k £10.50k N/A N/A £15.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £534.21k £404.10k N/A N/A £498.40k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0