DARULQURAAN SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The school aims to give pupils confidence in their abilities, helping them to deal with the challenges of the modern world. The school emphasises the need for success in their education and in life.The school endeavours to provide a flexible educational programme, catering for all needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 February 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samer Nehme | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALI ABDALLA A ABDULLRAHIM | Trustee | 22 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
KHEIRY AHMED EL TAHIER KHEIRY | Trustee | 22 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.56k | £4.00k | £18.05k | £6.46k | £9.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.49k | £3.90k | £21.81k | £5.85k | £9.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 April 2023 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 SEP 2013
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF QUR'AN AND ARABIC LANGUAGE STUDIES. 2) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN LONDON, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION, TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 19
Kingsgate House
536 Kings Road
London
SW10 0AF
- Phone:
- 07888601777
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window