Trustees IMMANUEL CHURCH BRENTWOOD

Charity number: 1156523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Andrew James Grey Chair 23 December 2013
None on record
Kirsten Lynne Witchalls Trustee 04 June 2023
None on record
Alison Joy Drummond Trustee 17 May 2020
None on record
Dr Mark Richard Smithers Trustee 19 May 2019
None on record
William Rolf Trump Trustee 19 May 2019
None on record
Denis Robert Parsons Trustee 10 September 2018
None on record
GAVIN LEWIS WRIGHT Trustee 23 December 2013
None on record