THE WEMBLEY TO SOWETO FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A global charity providing photographic training and life-skills to underprivileged youngsters to enable them to develop their potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Abu Dhabi
- Afghanistan
- Ajman
- Akrotiri
- Aland Islands
- Albania
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Andorra
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antarctica
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Aruba
- Ascension
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Baker Island
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bonaire
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Bouvet Island
- Brazil
- British Antarctic Territory
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Brunei
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Cayman Islands
- Central African Republic
- Ceuta
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Christmas Island
- Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dhekelia
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Dubai
- Easter Island
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Falkland Islands
- Faroe Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- French Southern Territories
- Fujairah
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Greenland
- Grenada
- Guadeloupe
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guernsey
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Heard Island And Mcdonald Islands
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Howland Island
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jarvis Island
- Jersey
- Johnston Atoll
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kingman Reef
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Martinique
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Melilla
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Midway Islands
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- Navassa Island
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Caledonia
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Norfolk Island
- Northern Ireland
- Northern Mariana Islands
- North Korea
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Palmyra Atoll
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Ras Al-khaimah
- Réunion
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saba
- Saint Barthélemy
- Saint Helena
- Saint-Martin
- Saint Pierre And Miquelon
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- San Marino
- São Tomé And Principe
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Sint Eustatius
- Sint Maarten
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Svalbard And Jan Mayen
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tristan Da Cunha
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- Umm Al-quwain
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- United States Virgin Islands
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Vanuatu
- Vatican City
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Wake Island
- Wallis And Futuna
- Western Sahara
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 08 May 2014: CIO registration
- W2S (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Magliano | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PHILLIPS | Trustee | 29 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAME JANET SUZMAN | Trustee | 29 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £560 | £0 | £0 | £181.22k | £94.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.98k | £2.03k | £2.38k | £167.31k | £97.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 May 2014
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE UK AND INTERNATIONALLY BY: (A) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING TO PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, IN PHOTOGRAPHY AND OTHER VISUAL MEDIA AND COMMUNICATION SKILLS, IN ORDER TO BETTER ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO EXPRESS THEMSELVES AND IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE AND THEREBY ALSO RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AND EXPERIENCES THEY ENCOUNTER; AND (B) SUPPORTING AND ADVISING OTHER CHARITIES, GROUPS AND ORGANISATIONS CARRYING OUT DEVELOPMENT PROJECTS IN THE USE OF PHOTOGRAPHY AND OTHER VISUAL MEDIA TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND/OR TO RELIEVE POVERTY OR OTHER HARDSHIP SUFFERED BY SUCH PERSONS. (2) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 CLIFTON HILL
BRIGHTON
BN1 3HQ
- Phone:
- 07973264477
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window