TRANSITIONS RESIDENTIAL THERAPEUTIC COMMUNITIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TRANSITIONS RTC IS ESTABLISHING A RESIDENTIAL THERAPEUTIC COMMUNITY FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 16-25 WITH DRUG/ALCOHOL PROBLEMS AND ADDICTIVE BEHAVIOUR. JOURNEYING WITH YOUNG PEOPLE TO SUPPORT THEM, IN ADOLESCENCE, MAKING THE TRANSITION TO A LIFE FREE FROM ADDICTIVE BEHAVIOURS THROUGH SPIRITUAL TRANSFORMATION, PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND GROWTH, DISCOVERING THEIR PURPOSE AND EXPERIENCING FUN AND FREEDOM.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- TRANSITIONS RTC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.42k | £24.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.07k | £28.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 15 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 19 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 09 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 10 September 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/12/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/05/2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE, PRIMARILY AGED 16-25, OF ANY RELIGION OR NONE, WHO HAVE DRUG/ALCOHOL AND OTHER ADDICTIVE BEHAVIOURAL ISSUES BY PROVIDING TREATMENT AND INTENSIVE SUPPORT IN MAKING THE TRANSITION TO A LIFE FREE FROM ADDICTION AND DESTRUCTIVE BEHAVIOUR, WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ENVIRONMENT AND ACCORDING TO CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window