BRADFORD CHINESE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekend Chinese School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 13 June 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR JIAN-PING LI PH.D | Chair | 25 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
WEI-YAN ZHANG | Trustee | 25 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
YAN-YAN ZHAO M.SC | Trustee | 25 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2018 | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.64k | £20.30k | £18.82k | £19.15k | £11.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.50k | £16.85k | £15.31k | £8.41k | £9.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 309 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 309 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 273 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2014
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN CHINESE MANDARIN AS A FOREIGN LANGUAGE AND IN CHINESE CULTURE BY THE PROVISION OF A SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL. 2) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Edale Grove
Queensbury
Bradford
BD13 2EF
- Phone:
- 01274234539
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window