Trustees MINGHAM MODERN CHINESE LANGUAGE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1157350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Feiyan Guang Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
pingting chen Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Lina Duan Trustee 26 May 2019
None on record
Xunlin Zhu Dr Trustee 19 November 2018
None on record
Yongyi Zhang Trustee 01 August 2017
None on record
Dr Fangmin Shi Dr Trustee 31 July 2016
None on record
Haiyan Zhang Trustee 30 June 2016
None on record
Dr Crystal Zhang PhD Trustee 31 May 2016
None on record
Jing Wang CPFA Trustee 01 December 2015
None on record