Financial history WALSWORTH ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1155718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £125.84k £100.10k £91.32k £100.90k £101.84k
Total expenditure £123.73k £102.24k £99.03k £107.11k £131.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £867 £853 N/A N/A