BPOSITIVE ACUTE LEUKAEMIA PATIENT SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A network of support for all those affected by blood cancer and beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 March 2014: Standard registration
- BPOSITIVE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONJO ROONEY | Chair | 09 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PRASHANT MOHA | Trustee | 09 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
HELEN HILL | Trustee | 09 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIE TAYLOR | Trustee | 09 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.82k | £5.80k | £671 | £342 | £956 | |
|
Total expenditure | £950 | £6.80k | £2.96k | £4.15k | £1.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1034 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1034 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 May 2022 | 284 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/10/2013 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2014
Charitable objects
1)TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF ACUTE LEUKAEMIA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT,INFORMATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO ACUTE LEUKAEMIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Fairoak Drive
BROMSGROVE
B60 3PN
- Phone:
- 07730606515
- Email:
- info@bpositive.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window