The Gamma Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of members of ethnic minority communities and the unemployed in the United Kingdom by the provision of orientation training courses and seminars and through the provision of advice, guidance and support; To relieve employment, in particular.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 January 2014: Standard registration
- MILLENIUM CHALLENGE ACADEMY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
loretta nguete | Chair | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Konadu | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Animwaa Agyemang | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Griffiths Nguete | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Cecile Biloa ABAH | Trustee | 02 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.90k | £6.50k | £5.50k | £6.50k | £10.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.50k | £6.40k | £5.20k | £6.45k | £10.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 September 2020 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 08/01/2014 as amended on 20 Mar 2023 as amended on 23 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PERSONS LIVING IN THE BOROUGH OF BARKING AND DAGENHAM, ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FREE EDUCATIONAL COURSES TO PEOPLE WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 706
Harmony Building
31 City Island Way
LONDON
E14 0QE
- Phone:
- 07863130628
- Email:
- GAMMAFOUNDATION@YAHOO.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window