WHITTON YOUTH PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a half term holiday club during the October half term for children in the NW Ipswich area. To provide a "Steppin'Up" event during the May half term for pupils from the local primary school who have been identified by the School as likely to have difficult making the transition to High School. To run a monthly movie club for young people of the area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £4,440 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 31 January 2014: CIO registration
- 30 March 2021: Funds received from 1120317 ANGLIAN RADIO TRUST LIMITED
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAYMOND BOGGIS | Chair | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lane | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Budden | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mary Noreen Cecily SOKANOVIC | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Charlie Galloway | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Coward | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Alice Jackaman | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR JAMES DONALD MANNING | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JAMES KEEBLE | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.93k | £76.78k | £77.61k | £57.43k | £14.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.69k | £44.71k | £42.79k | £55.68k | £50.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.25k | £13.04k | £10.00k | £4.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 31 Jan 2014
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN WHITTON AND NORTH IPSWICH BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 HAZELCROFT ROAD
IPSWICH
IP1 6AW
- Phone:
- 01473741671
- Email:
- jimjanmanning@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window