CARING FOR GOD'S ACRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE CONSERVATION, ENHANCEMENT AND INTERPRETATION OF THE NATURAL AND BUILT FEATURES OF CHURCHYARDS AND BURIAL GROUNDS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine MacCarthy | Chair | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
COLIN FENN | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev DAVID PRIMROSE | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Simon Cooter | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Paul Glanville | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judith Leigh | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD OLIVER GOODE | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MISS ANNI HOLDEN | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.58k | £227.70k | £268.22k | £314.91k | £165.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £234.67k | £189.94k | £250.66k | £278.91k | £174.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.74k | £33.00k | £76.03k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 29 Jan 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE CONSERVATION, ENHANCEMENT AND INTERPRETATION OF THE NATURAL AND BUILT FEATURES OF CHURCHYARDS AND BURIAL GROUNDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Caring for Gods Acre
Unit 11
Drovers House
The Auction Yard
Craven Arms
SY7 9BZ
- Phone:
- 01588 673041
- Email:
- info@cfga.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window