COMMUNITY FOREST LAND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable activitis are those of the enhancement and improvement, maintenance and protection of the environment and landscape within the North West, for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- St Helens
Governance
- 28 February 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL ANTHONY NOLAN BSC MSC | Chair | 27 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Roger Pearson | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|||||
DAVID SHAW | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
David McAleavy | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.82k | £426 | £5 | £5.73k | £456 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.61k | £8.03k | £3.74k | £2.29k | £3.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 OCT 2013
Charitable objects
1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WITHIN THE NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND OR ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE CONNECTED WITH THE ENHANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT, MAINTENANCE AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND LANDSCAPE AND IN PARTICULAR TO: (1) PROMOTE, PROVIDE AND ENHANCE WOODLAND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; (2) PROMOTE THE GENERAL IMPROVEMENT OF AGRICULTURE AND OF INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO WOODLAND OR FORESTRY PRODUCTS; (3) PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF DERELICT LAND OR HARMFUL SITES; (4) PROVIDE OR HELP TO PROVIDE FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION PARTICULARLY INVOLVING THE ENJOYMENT OF LAND AND WOODLAND AS A PUBLIC AMENITY (AND IN FURTHERANCE TO HELP TO PROVIDE SAFE AND CONVENIENT ROUTES AND MODES OF TRANSPORT FOR THE PUBLIC, FOR SAFE CYCLING, AND FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF FACILITIES INCLUDING NATURE TRAILS, RESERVES AND SANCTUARIES, HORSE AND CYCLE AND FOOTWAYS, PARKLAND AND VISITOR FACILITIES AND CAR PARKS); (5) PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING PARTICULAR SPORTS; (6) EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS, IN ECOLOGY AND PROVIDE BETTER APPRECIATION OF THE ENVIRONMENTS AND WAYS OF BETTER SERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE SAME AND EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE ENVIRONMENT AND ITS INTERACTION WITH THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC WELLBEING OF THE COMMUNITY; (7) PROMOTE THE ARTS WITHIN THE WOODLAND AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENTS; (8) PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE ECOLOGY AND USE OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND ALL SPECIES LIVING IN IT; (9) PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, ENHANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE IMPORTANCE OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN RELATION TO ALL THE ACTIVITIES OF THE CHARITY. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS SUB-ARTICLE, THE PHRASE “SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT” SHALL MEAN DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS AND IN APPLYING THIS DEFINITION REGARD SHALL BE HAD TO THE FOLLOWING FACTORS NAMELY, TO SOCIAL PROGRESS WHICH RECOGNISES THE NEEDS OF EVERYONE; EFFECTIVE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES AND MAINTENANCE OF HIGH AND STABLE LEVELS OF ECONOMIC GROWTH AND EMPLOYMENT; (10) PROMOTE AND PROTECT “GREEN INFRASTRUCTURE” WHICH SHALL MEAN THE LIVING NETWORK OF GREEN SPACES, WATER AND OTHER ENVIRONMENTAL FEATURES IN BOTH RURAL AND URBAN AREAS AND SHALL INCLUDE TREES, PARKS, GARDENS, ROAD VERGES, ALLOTMENTS, CEMETERIES, WOODLANDS, RIVERS, WETLANDS, FARMLAND AND OTHER NATURAL FEATURES THAT OPERATE AS FLOOD PROTECTION, CARBON STORAGE OR WATER PURIFICATION; AND (11) PROTECT THE ENVIRONMENT AGAINST THE EFFECTS OF CLIMATE CHANGE INCLUDING THE CARRYING OUT OF ACTIVITIES TO MITIGATE THE EFFECTS OF, AND ADAPT TO, CLIMATE CHANGE. 2. SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 TWISS GREEN DRIVE
CULCHETH
WARRINGTON
WA3 4HY
- Phone:
- 01925816217
- Email:
- info@cf-trust.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window