THE FRIENDS OF YSGOL CEDEWAIN (SPECIAL SCHOOL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTE THE WELFARE & ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS WHO ATTEND YSGOL CEDEWAIN THROUGH FUND RAISING ACTIVITIES - WE FUND RAISE THROUGH MANY SOURCES; FAYRE'S, SPONSORED EVENTS, APPLICATIONS FOR SPECIFIC GRANTS - WE AIM TO PROVIDE & SUPPORT EQUIPMENT & ACTIVITIES THAT ARE OUTSIDE THE REMIT OF THE LEA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Powys
Governance
- 21 June 1979: Standard registration
- 27 March 2019: Funds received from 1000016 PLAY MONTGOMERYSHIRE
- THE FRIENDS OF CEDEWAIN (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Dyos | Chair | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
LISA STEPHENS | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Haf Pugh | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carys Bowen | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Luke Pinder | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Knowles | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Pinder | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Pugh | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Davies | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Jarvis | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
DARREN LEACH | Trustee | 29 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Sandilands | Trustee | 12 March 1990 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE PUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.31k | £1.95k | £2.37k | £2.83k | £3.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.57k | £17.73k | £1.17k | £3.01k | £1.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAY 1979, AS AMENDED 6 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF YSGOL CEDEWAIN (SPECIAL SCHOOL) AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE:- A) TO RAISE FUNDS AND RECEIVE DONATIONS, B) TO PROVIDE ADDITIONAL BENEFITS FOR THE CHILDREN BEYOND THE NORMAL PROVISIONS MADE BY THE EDUCATION AUTHORITY, C) MAINTAIN A MINI BUS, D) PROVIDE CHRISTMAS TREATS.
Area of benefit
THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CADEWAIN SCHOOL
PLANTATION LANE
NEWTOWN
SY16 1LH
- Phone:
- 01686627454
- Email:
- gills@cedewain.powys.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window