Accounts and annual returns ALLIED SPECIAL FORCES ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1156925
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 19 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 28 July 2016 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required