ALLIED SPECIAL FORCES ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our object is to develop and maintain the Allied Special Forces Memorial Grove situated within the National Memorial Arboretum as a place for remembrance, commemoration, education and quiet contemplation, in harmony with nature, and include memorials to the men and women who served with or assisted the Allied Special Forces during world war two and in conflicts since.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 06 May 2014: Standard registration
- 10 October 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ALLIED SPECIAL FORCES MEMORIAL GROVE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.88k | £22.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.37k | £20.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 19 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 28 July 2016 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/04/2008 AS AMENDED ON 26/01/2014
Charitable objects
(A) TO DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN THE ALLIED SPECIAL FORCES MEMORIAL GROVE AS AN INDEPENDENTLY FUNDED AMENITY, GARDEN AREA AND OPEN SPACE SITUATED WITHIN THE NATIONAL MEMORIAL ARBORETUM, ALREWAS, STAFFORDSHIRE. THE GARDENS WILL BE A PLACE FOR REMEMBRANCE, COMMEMORATION, EDUCATION AND QUIET CONTEMPLATION, IN HARMONY WITH NATURE, AND INCLUDE MEMORIALS TO THE MEN AND WOMEN WHO SERVED WITH OR ASSISTED THE ALLIED SPECIAL FORCES DURING WORLD WAR TWO AND IN CONFLICTS SINCE. (B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC, VETERANS AND ARMED FORCES ABOUT THE CIVILIAN AND MILITARY COMMEMORATIONS IN THE GROVE WITHOUT INFRINGING ON PERSONAL OR NATIONAL SECURITY.
Area of benefit
STAFFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window