ATTIC PROJECT

Charity number: 1158300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To further or benefit the residents of Bury and the neighbourhood, without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious or other opinions by associating together the said residents and local authorities, voluntary or other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £99,785
Total expenditure: £72,686

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolton
  • Bury
  • Lancashire
  • Oldham
  • Rochdale

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 August 2014: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ezekiel Wakudyanaye Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Christopher Fargher Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Joseph Roantree Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Tracy Turner Trustee 28 August 2015
None on record
DAVID STOPFORD Trustee 20 August 2014
None on record
DAWN TURNBULL Trustee 20 August 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £37.19k £122.37k £107.38k £64.38k £99.79k
Total expenditure £28.76k £87.15k £88.61k £58.60k £72.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 25 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
27 HARTSOP DRIVE
MIDDLETON
MANCHESTER
M24 4JH
Phone:
01616549282
Website:

No information available