INGLEWHITE CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a church we hold regular Sunday and weekday services. We also organise many other weekly activities for people of all ages. All our activities are financed by free will offerings given by attendees. We participate in local community activities, as well as supporting worldwide mission activities, particularly through International Aid Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 25 July 2014: Standard registration
- INGLEWHITE CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN DAVID HARDMAN | Chair | 25 January 2018 |
|
|||||||
JACQUELINE CLARK | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
ANTHONY LEO BROOKS | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
RACHEL GLASCOTT | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
STEPHEN FREDERICK GEORGE SLOSS | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Andrews | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.50k | £138.07k | £123.83k | £177.01k | £158.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.63k | £132.84k | £100.25k | £138.48k | £181.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16/09/2010
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES AND USAGES FOR THE TIME BEING OF CONGREGATIONALISM AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY SPECIFIC REQUIREMENTS IN THE FOUNDATION TRUSTS. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION RELIEVE NEED AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Inglewhite Congregational Church
Silk Mill Lane
Goosnargh
PRESTON
PR3 2LP
- Phone:
- 01995641175
- Email:
- inglewhitechurch@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window