STALHAM COMMUNITY GYM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stalham Community Gym provides a health, wellbeing and fitness service to residents of Stalham and surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 07 July 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Munford | Chair | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Reyner | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Clements | Trustee | 03 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lis Brooks | Trustee | 03 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.60k | £10.53k | £13.25k | £14.51k | £21.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.17k | £10.58k | £11.40k | £16.16k | £18.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 APR 2014 AS AMENDED ON 30/06/2014 as amended on 02 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STALHAM, NORWICH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; 2. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY GYM; 3. THE OF ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND TRAINING IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO HEALTH INCLUDING EXERCISE AND HEALTHY EATING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Wilson Road
Stalham
NORWICH
NR12 9FL
- Phone:
- 07547 321874
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window