ROUTES TO ROOTS (POOLE) CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Routes to Roots is a drop-in centre for those experiencing homelessness, newly homed and vulnerably housed adults in Poole. R2R provides a drop in centre and hot lunch Mon-Fri, showers, washing facilities and offers signposting to other agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Poole
Governance
- R2R (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATE MELLOR | Chair | 19 February 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
REV LUCINDA JANE HOLT | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Andrew Teale | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Martin Finch | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
REV PAT SOUTHGATE | Trustee | 19 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.20k | £165.22k | £196.72k | £154.72k | £154.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.35k | £178.82k | £243.36k | £107.14k | £107.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 26 Feb 2014 as amended on 01 Jun 2023 as amended on 01 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ROUGH SLEEPERS AND VULNERABLY HOUSED PEOPLE IN THE BOROUGH OF POOLE BY FURTHERING SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, THE TERM 'ROUGH SLEEPERS AND VULNERABLY HOUSED' MEANS ANYONE WITHOUT A HOME, THOSE LIVING ON THE STREETS, THOSE WITH NO FIXED ABODE, THOSE IN MAKESHIFT ACCOMODATION, THOSE IN EMERGENCY ACCOMODATION, THOSE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED HOMELESSNESS AND THOSE WHO ARE AT RISK OF BECOMING HOMELESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Genesis Centre
Hill Street
POOLE
Dorset
BH15 1NR
- Phone:
- 01202667880
- Email:
- office@routestoroots.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window