MIGHTY OAKS YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1157072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing a safe environment for 10-13 year olds to enjoy a wide variety of educational and social activities including sports, arts and crafts, cookery and games. A place for them to socialise and have fun in the Hurst Green and surrounding areas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 May 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rose Thorn Chair 14 March 2018
None on record
TARA THOMAS Trustee 27 January 2014
None on record
MR DAN GREEN Trustee 27 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £831 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.16k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 31 January 2025 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 September 2022 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 September 2022 441 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
72 Pollards Oak Road
Oxted
RH8 0JW
Phone:
01883372610
Website:

No information available