KINGDOM MANDATE MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In the year 2015, the charity stayed true to its constitutional object as we taught the teachings of the Bible and empowered the members to use their knowledge and giftings in serving God, the members and the community at large. We provided support financial and other means for the divorced, single mothers, the Hurting in our midst and those who joined us from the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 September 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV CHARLES OBENG MASTERS | Chair | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
BEATRICE AFUA AFARI | Trustee | 28 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CONSTANCE OBENG | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS YAW AMANKWAAH | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.56k | £20.74k | £21.78k | £17.19k | £7.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.07k | £6.04k | £3.25k | £4.66k | £3.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2024 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED ON 19/09/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE KINGDOM MANDATE MINISTRIES IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PRIMARILY IN LONDON AND THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND THE REST OF THE WORLD BY ALL MEANS CONSISTENT WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE BIBLE INCLUDING MINISTRY, MISSION, EDUCATION, COMMUNITY SERVICE AND THE SUPPORT OF AGENCIES AND INDIVIDUALS AND OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANIZATIONS INVOLVED IN CHRISTIAN MISSIONARY WORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 ARTHINGWORTH STREET
STRATFORD
LONDON
E15 4PW
- Phone:
- 02085194234
- Email:
- c.obeng@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window