EAGLE'S NEST PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Eagle's Nest Project seeks to provide alternative education solutions for young people on the margins of mainstream. This currently involves mentoring and providing short term small group courses for clusters of students. The long term vision is to see residential schools set up in small farms, outdoor centres or similar where young people learn the life skills they need to succeed for life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £253,725 from 30 government contract(s) and £1,930 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 March 2014: CIO registration
- 12 January 2021: Funds received from 1107129 THE COMMUNITY CHURCH (IW)
- EAGLE'S NEST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DUNCAN LAYZELL | Chair | 04 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Penelope Eleanor Meekings | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Timothy Watson | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John David Edmonds | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.09k | £139.27k | £204.72k | £315.50k | £410.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.47k | £134.76k | £157.01k | £271.11k | £341.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £75.57k | £104.30k | £120.84k | £187.10k | £253.73k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.93k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Mar 2014 as amended on 15 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE UK WHO ARE NOT ABLE TO ENGAGE EFFECTIVELY WITHIN THE MAINSTREAM EDUCATIONAL SETTING BY PROVIDING ALTERNATIVE EDUCATION IN THE FORM OF COURSES AND TRAINING, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR FUTURE LIFE PROSPECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eagles Nest Project
2 Main Street
Branston
BURTON-ON-TRENT
Staffordshire
DE14 3EX
- Phone:
- 01283 830597
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window