Financial history RINGWOOD WALDORF SCHOOL

Charity number: 1158673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.11m £1.03m £1.41m £1.55m £1.63m
Total expenditure £975.16k £1.08m £1.30m £1.61m £1.58m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £186.06k £32.35k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £217.55k £67.36k £46.13k £60.10k £51.54k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £873.79k £961.44k £1.36m £1.49m £1.57m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £182 £128 £129 £2.72k £11.70k
Income - Other £14.64k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £965.65k £1.08m £1.30m £1.60m £1.57m
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.51k £887 £2.13k £4.06k £12.38k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0