Financial history FORDEN RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £12.59k £20.63k £11.50k £11.40k £13.83k
Total expenditure £10.74k £12.26k £3.96k £6.37k £10.51k
Income from government contracts N/A £5.58k £3.15k £4.20k £6.00k
Income from government grants £1.90k £11.90k £6.90k £4.00k £2.00k