Accounts and annual returns KATRINA CHARITY OF ANGELS

Charity number: 1158804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 February 2024 03 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 04 February 2023 04 February 2024 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 04 February 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 February 2021 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 February 2020 20 January 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 February 2020 Not Required