Financial history CREATION MYTH PUPPETS

Charity Number: 1157652
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £54.83k £17.15k £36.44k £43.38k £27.01k
Total expenditure £50.38k £17.99k £30.96k £49.18k £31.61k
Income from government contracts N/A £8.85k £7.60k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k N/A £1.54k £14.70k N/A