MOSAIC - SUPPORTING BEREAVED CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mosaic- Supporting Bereaved Children offers a pathway of support for bereaved children, young people and their families, providing individual, family and group work, therapeutic residential weekends and social activities. Mosaic also offers support to those young people facing the death of a loved one. Mosaic provides support for agencies and professionals working with young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £42,350 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- MOSAIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Hinnrichs | Chair | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Grassby | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Gurth Burleigh | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rowan Seymour | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Cradock | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Bellingham | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rollo Clifford | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £330.72k | £282.18k | £260.17k | £365.49k | £437.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £311.93k | £245.66k | £309.57k | £394.58k | £475.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £11.80k | £23.04k | N/A | £90.20k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.70k | £23.25k | £42.10k | N/A | £42.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Aug 2014 as amended on 29 Nov 2024 as amended on 29 Nov 2024 as amended on 29 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS CAUSED BY BEREAVEMENT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED BEREAVEMENT; AND 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF BEREAVEMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 4
Barnes Croft
Coles Lane
Milborne St. Andrew
BLANDFORD FORUM
Dorset
- Phone:
- 01258837071
- Email:
- info@mosaicfamilysupport.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window