DIG IT COMMUNITY ALLOTMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dig It Community Allotment run regular activity sessions at our allotment site and local outdoor spaces where we welcome people of all ages and abilities. Volunteers can come and learn about food growing, healthy eating, plants and eco garden & site management whilst keeping fit and being part of a friendly, supportive group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £10,147 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Suffolk
Governance
- 14 May 2014: CIO registration
- DIG IT COMMUNITY ALLOTMENT / DIG IT GARDENS (Working name)
- DIG IT COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Taylor | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sean Manchip | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Payne | Trustee | 29 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Horner | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12 | £12.04k | £10.37k | £26.25k | £40.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.75k | £7.96k | £13.75k | £23.91k | £33.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.97k | £6.00k | £2.50k | £10.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 May 2014
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION,TRAINING AND RETRAINING OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND THOSE WITH MENTAL OR PHYSICAL HEALTH CONDITIONS IN THE SUBJECTS OF SUSTAINABLE HORTICULTURE,FOOD GROWING PRACTICE AND HEALTHY LIFESTYLES.2)TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED,RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY,OR PARTS OF SOCIETY,AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS:UNEMPLOYMENT;FINANCIAL HARDSHIP;YOUTH OR OLD AGE;ILL HEALTH(PHYSICAL OR MENTAL);SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS;DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX,RACE,DISABILITY,ETHNIC ORIGIN,RELIGION,BELIEF,CREED,SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT;POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT;RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN;POOR HOUSING(THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS;CRIME(EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY)
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Audley End
SAFFRON WALDEN
Essex
CB11 4JB
- Phone:
- 07850080869
- Email:
- info@dig-itgardens.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window