NOTTINGHAMSHIRE BLOOD BIKES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to provide free transport services for National Health Service patients or providers in situations where they would otherwise have no free alternative, or where the timescale for such alternatives would be detrimental to their operational requirements or to patient care. This service is primarily aimed at service provisions within Nottinghamshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
125 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 28 February 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Marianne Mileham | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Russell William John McFadden | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Tracey McFadden | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.76k | £70.83k | £36.73k | £47.44k | £99.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.03k | £96.13k | £27.16k | £36.57k | £106.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 12 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/11/2013 AS AMENDED ON 18/12/2014 as amended on 28 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS: TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF TRANSPORT OF URGENTLY NEEDED BLOOD, DRUGS, HUMAN BREAST MILK AND OTHER MEDICAL REQUIREMENTS BETWEEN HOSPITALS AND BLOOD TRANSFUSION BANKS PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN NOTTINGHAMSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Secretary, Miss Naomi McFadden
Nelsons Solicitors
Pennine House
8 Stanford Street
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 7BQ
- Phone:
- 08456099908
- Email:
- enquiries@nottsbb.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window