Financial history Gerry Richardson Trust

Charity Number: 504413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.39k £8.73k £4.60k £45.51k £5.02k
Total expenditure £6.93k £736 £9.39k £8.57k £14.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A