Gerry Richardson Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust seeks to promote youth development by supporting young people, aged 25 or under, to attend courses and activities of an educational, cultural, sporting, adventuresome or character-building nature. It is willing to entertain written applications for financial assistance from young people living or working within 15 miles of the town hall in Blackpool.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Blackpool
- Lancashire
Governance
- 25 July 1975: Standard registration
- SUPERINTENDENT GERALD RICHARDSON MEMORIAL YOUTH TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Michael Hardy | Chair | 06 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Andrew Henry Mitchell | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angela Dorothy Butcher | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Pickard | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Pickard | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Longden | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire-Louise van Deurs Goss | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Louise Clarke | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Tupman | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lee Martin Wilson | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE LONGDON BEM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.39k | £8.73k | £4.60k | £45.51k | £5.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.93k | £736 | £9.39k | £8.57k | £14.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 April 2025 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 OCTOBER 1974 as amended on 03 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME FOR THE PURPOSES OF SO HELPING AND EDUCATING YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE ACTIVITIES AND BY ATTENDING COURSES AT OUTWARD BOUND SCHOOLS OR OTHERWISE AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES AND CHARACTERS, THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE TRUST DEED DATED 16 OCTOBER 1974.
Area of benefit
AN AREA OF FIFTEEN MILES FROM THE TOWN HALL IN BLACKPOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTHDENE
STONEY LANE
HAMBLETON
POULTON-LE-FYLDE
FY6 9AF
- Phone:
- 01253 700879
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window