LETS DO IT ANYWAY

Charity Number: 1155862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Lets Do It Anyway is a non profit Norfolk based Charitable Trust & our mission is to promote social welfare & equality inclusion for children and adults of all ages. We provide mobility equipment, services or facilities, to encourage people to get active, feel empowered and socially included. We also deliver annual December and New Year Wishes to adults and children who have faced adversity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £557
Total expenditure: £1,423

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 February 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • LDIA OR LETS DO IT ANYWAY FUNDING. (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tonya Knights Chair 22 January 2014
None on record
Melissa Townshend Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
DIANE MARTIN Trustee 22 January 2014
None on record
DAVID KNIGHTS Trustee 22 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.76k £189 £66 £1.70k £557
Total expenditure £9.62k £2.62k £1.04k £1.93k £1.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 November 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
146 Ormesby Road
Badersfield
Norwich
NR10 5LA
Phone:
01603516150