JAZZ PROMOTION NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of jazz and related music through and beyond a membership network; staging of an annual conference for the sector (in 2018 in Southampton); development of a long-term plan for support of the music and the sector; advocacy at home and overseas; a pilot tour of Emerging Artists; & the Going Dutch programme to encourage the interchange of Dutch and JPN-nations' promoters and musicians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 February 2015: CIO registration
- JPN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ros Rigby | Chair | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Orphy Robinson | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Spencer | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Kass | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN aka NOD KNOWLES | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Agnese Daverio | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Slavid | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Keith Michael | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.86k | £101.26k | £7.66k | £28.25k | £42.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.41k | £42.69k | £51.40k | £53.05k | £36.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £90.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 02 Feb 2015 as amended on 01 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE JPN ARE TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING, APPRECIATION OF, AND PARTICIPATION IN, THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR IN THE ARTS OF JAZZ AND RELATED FORMS OF MUSIC, AND IN PARTICULAR THROUGH MUTUAL SUPPORT AND ACTIONS AMONGST ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS COMMITTED TO THE PURSUIT OF THIS COMMON PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 SOUTHVILLE TERRACE
BATH
BA2 4LZ
- Phone:
- 07880703518
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window