Accounts and annual returns MANCHESTER WOMENS AID

Charity Number: 504417
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 07 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 31 July 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 19 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 18 July 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 15 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 25 July 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 24 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 25 July 2005 On Time