Financial history MANCHESTER WOMENS AID

Charity number: 504417
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £241.87k £239.72k £239.72k £219.36k £223
Total expenditure £191.47k £237.45k £237.45k £224.87k £239
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A