FUNDELASHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We prevent and relieve poverty; build the capacity of disadvantaged communities; promote social inclusion; and relieve sickness by working with partners in the Eastern Cape to reduce the impact of HIV and AIDS and poverty on rural communities and some locations in mThatha. We do this by supporting community projects and providing training to community members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brighton And Hove
- South Africa
Governance
- 14 July 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREA MASON | Chair | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adele Peck | Trustee | 15 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robbie Coull | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Bidwell | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.78k | £11.45k | £5.18k | £13.17k | £10.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.39k | £13.35k | £8.76k | £3.49k | £7.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15/06/2014
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD,IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN THE EASTERN CAPE,SOUTH AFRICA:-TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP;2)TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH,IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY HIV AND AIDS;3)O DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY,AND HELP MEET,THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY;4)TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED,RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY,OR PARTS OF SOCIETY,AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS:RACE,GENDER,DISABILITY,SEXUAL ORIENTATION,RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE PEOPLE LIVING WITH HIV.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Argyle Road
BRIGHTON
BN1 4QA
- Phone:
- 07736524200
- Email:
- info@fundelaship.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window