ROSE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for people who are currently serving or have served in the armed forces and their families,through rehabilitation and transition into civilian life. Assist people with physical and mental disabilities or mental distress. Promote facilities for sport and encourage fitness and healthy living To assist young people to grow to full maturity as individuals and develop social skills
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 May 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN MADSEN | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK STEWART | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
LESTER GALLEY | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.01k | £724 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.94k | £3.55k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 May 2021 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 JAN 2014
Charitable objects
OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO RAISE FUND FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES TO EITHER DIRECTLY GRANT OR INDIRECTLY THROUGH THE DISTRIBUTION TO OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS, WITH THE SAME OR SIMILAR OBJECTS, TO (A) ASSIST PERSONS WHO ARE CURRENTLY SERVING OR WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE ARMED FORCES AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THOSE THAT HAVE BEEN WOUNDED WHILST SERVING IN THE ARMED FORCES BY MAKING GRANTS TO PURCHASE EQUIPMENT FOR THEIR REHABILITATION (B) PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES WHO HAVE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL DISABILITIES AND/OR ARE SUFFERING MENTAL DISTRESS (C) PROMOTE HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF SPORTS (D) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. (E) TO PROVIDE SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Roseville (Projects) Ltd
Unit 2/A
Guildprime Business Centre
Southend Road
Billericay
CM11 2PZ
- Phone:
- 01277630101
- Email:
- ken.girkin@roseville.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window