Embrace (Bedford and District)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Embrace (formerly BDCPS) is a small charity based in Bedfordshire established since 1954. Our mission is to provide unwavering support to families living with complex disabilities, sharing our knowledge and understanding to empower each individual we encounter along their unique journey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £106,410 from 2 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- BEDFORD & DISTRICT CEREBRAL PALSY SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Lockyer | Chair | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Murray | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Mortimer | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Weir | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Noble | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rajan Kanda | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Broughton-Welsh | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN SWAISLAND | Trustee | 14 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
LEE MOSTARI | Trustee | 14 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNAH LEE | Trustee | 14 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £291.03k | £216.67k | £214.68k | £244.98k | £253.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.79k | £232.00k | £247.73k | £292.14k | £346.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £108.00k | £104.00k | £98.97k | £97.00k | £106.41k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.04k | £9.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 31 Mar 2014 as amended on 21 Nov 2023 as amended on 29 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE PERSONS WITH ANY FORM OF CEREBRAL PALSY OR A RELATED DISABILITY BY ASSISTING IN THE CARE, WELFARE, TREATMENT AND EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS AND OF THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN THE BEDFORD BOROUGH AND CENTRAL BEDFORDSHIRE REGIONS BUT WITH POWER FOR THE TRUSTEES TO ASSIST PEOPLE REQUIRING ASSISTANCE OR APPROPRIATE ORGANISATIONS IN THE IMMEDIATELY ADJOINING AREAS IF THEY CONSIDER THIS TO BE APPROPRIATE.NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
IN THE BEDFORD BOROUGH AND CENTRAL BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Embrace
43 Bromham Road
BEDFORD
MK40 2AA
- Phone:
- 01234351759
- Email:
- info@embrace.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window