EXPERT IMPACT

Charity Number: 1157065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Expert Impact facilitates a 'Human Lending Library' through which entrepreneurs can 'borrow' successful entrepreneurs to help them solve their challenges and grow. Founders of ventures in our target sectors apply for hour-long sessions with our Experts. We screen applicants matching them with the appropriate Expert best suited to advise them. Some social organisations receive deeper support.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £8,573
Total expenditure: £48,516

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 May 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Joanne Allen Chair 16 September 2024
None on record
Sabira Kanji Trustee 03 November 2021
None on record
Colin Downie Trustee 03 November 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £250.00k £276.51k £76.25k £86.52k £8.57k
Total expenditure £224.48k £202.59k £164.28k £140.60k £48.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £15.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 27 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 10 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 01 May 2024 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 01 May 2024 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 28 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 30 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SEUK Shared Services 13-15 Dock St
Tower hamlets
London
E1 8JN
Phone:
07738195504
Website:

expertimpact.com