NEWTON REGIS VILLAGE HALL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY WORKS TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE NEWTON REGIS VILLAGE HALL AND ITS SERVICES ON A SELF FINANCING BASIS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 27 June 2014: CIO registration
- 29 October 2014: Funds received from 1098872 NEWTON REGIS VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYN KESTERTON | Chair | 24 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Chalonder | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Hundley | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hopkins | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL KESTERTON | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEVE HALE | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Taylor | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY LEDGARD | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.25k | £20.73k | £29.09k | £37.90k | £29.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.91k | £23.71k | £26.85k | £33.44k | £23.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF NEWTON REGIS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Institute House
Main Road
Newton Regis
TAMWORTH
B79 0NE
- Phone:
- 01827 830274
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window