TRANSFORMING LIVES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES EDUCATION / TRAINING THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING OF LIVES DISABILITY THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ACCOMMODATION / HOUSING ECONOMIC / COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT / EMPLOYMENT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 September 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL EDWIN MARSHALL | Chair | 04 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
CATRIONA FRANCES MARSHALL | Trustee | 04 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ANTHONY MARSHALL | Trustee | 04 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr KATHERINE JANE SUTTON | Trustee | 04 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/05/2020 | 30/05/2021 | 30/05/2022 | 30/05/2023 | 30/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.84k | £6.30k | £56.81k | £68.46k | £133.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.49k | £64.10k | £83.55k | £88.76k | £100.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2023 | 26 February 2025 | 333 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2023 | 26 February 2025 | 333 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2022 | 25 May 2023 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2022 | 25 May 2023 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Sep 2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND SERVICES TO PEOPLE IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brick Bank
Allostock
KNUTSFORD
Cheshire
WA16 9LY
- Phone:
- 07836 203651
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window