ORTHOCYCLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Orthocycle's current activities Outside the UK provide surgical training / treatment to less developed nations, especially those affected by conflict Inside the UK provide surgical training to UK doctors on the subject of foot and ankle provide surgical training to UK doctors on the subject of external fixation provide training to UK doctors on aspects of major incident management
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
- Syria
- Tanzania
Governance
- 11 November 2014: CIO registration
- ORTHOCYCLE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR AMER SHOAIB BSC(HONS) LMSSA MRCS(ED) FRCS(ORTHO | Chair | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr CAROL-ANN MCARDLE | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.34k | £7.06k | £10.98k | £71.57k | £17.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.80k | £6.80k | £7.85k | £67.81k | £21.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 February 2025 | 376 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 February 2025 | 376 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SUBJECT OF HEALTHCARE 2) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH BY EDUCATING HEALTH WORKERS WORKING WITH THE PUBLIC AND PROVIDING RECYCLED MEDICAL ITEMS 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH BY RELIEF OF SICKNESS, DISEASE OR HUMAN SUFFERING
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 PALATINE ROAD
WITHINGTON
MANCHESTER
M20 3LJ
- Phone:
- 07595627385
- Email:
- info@orthocycle.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window