PRIDDY PARENT & TEACHER'S ASSOCIATION & FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising activities include key annual events: running the popular 'Green Cow Cafe' at Priddy Folk Festival (the PTA's main fundraising event for the school); hosting Discos, Movie Nights, Christmas celebrations. In addition, updating a space a the schools that is inviting, outdoor equipment for each suite. Paying for annual education subscriptions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- Priddy & St Lawrence's PTA (Working name)
- PRIDDY PARENT & TEACHER'S ASSOCIATION AND FRIENDS (Previous name)
- PRIDDY PTA AND FRIENDS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Cambridge | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Knight | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALISON STONE | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.92k | £3.65k | £0 | £14.82k | £17.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.16k | £3.81k | £1.81k | £7.03k | £22.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 October 2023 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 October 2023 | 463 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 July 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 July 2021 | 369 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 DEC 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Lawrence C Of E Primary School
Westbury Sub Mendip
WELLS
Somerset
BA5 1HL
- Phone:
- 01749 870437
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window