LIVING HOPE PROJECT

Charity Number: 1157086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Living hope is a registered charity to fund and support the education of underprovided in the area of Baddomalhi, Pakistan

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,275
Total expenditure: £3,430

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Pakistan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 May 2014: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev IMRAN MALIK Chair 14 February 2014
None on record
HANNAH Charlotte Simpson Trustee 14 February 2014
None on record
SARAH LOUISE MALIK Trustee 14 February 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.55k £8.67k £7.42k £9.34k £5.28k
Total expenditure £7.88k £9.04k £7.31k £9.14k £3.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 Portland Road
PAISLEY
Renfrewshire
PA2 7GH
Phone:
01134730458